UT HB0001S02 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0001
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-19 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-19 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Education Base Budget Amendments
Title
Public Education Base Budget Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-02-07 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-06 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-05 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-05 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-02-05 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-05 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in H3RDHB |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in H3RDHB |
2014-02-03 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTRUL |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in HCLERK |
2013-12-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-12-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0001 (Replaces) 2014-02-04 - House/ substituted in HSUB