US SR88 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1134-1135; text as passed Senate: CR S1170-1171)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1134-1135; text as passed Senate: CR S1170-1171)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution celebrating Black History Month. Recognizes Black History Month as an opportunity to reflect on U.S. history and recognize the contributions of African Americans. Calls for the United States to: (1) honor the contribution of pioneers who helped to ensure its legacy; and (2) move forward as "one Nation . . . indivisible, with liberty and justice for all."
Title
A resolution celebrating Black History Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] |
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] | Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1134-1135; text as passed Senate: CR S1170-1171) |
Same As/Similar To
SR84 (Same As) 2015-02-23 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1033-1034)
SR372 (Related) 2016-02-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1000-1001)
SR379 (Related) 2016-02-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1101; text as passed Senate: CR S1088-1089)
SR372 (Related) 2016-02-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1000-1001)
SR379 (Related) 2016-02-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1101; text as passed Senate: CR S1088-1089)
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Ethnic studies
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Ethnic studies
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-resolution/88/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/sres88/BILLS-114sres88ats.pdf |