US SR379 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1101; text as passed Senate: CR S1088-1089)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1101; text as passed Senate: CR S1088-1089)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution celebrating Black History Month. Recognizes Black History Month as an opportunity to reflect on U.S. history and to commemorate the contributions of African Americans. Calls for the United States to: (1) honor the contribution of pioneers who helped to ensure its legacy; and (2) move forward as a nation "indivisible, with liberty and justice for all."
Title
A resolution celebrating Black History Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1101; text as passed Senate: CR S1088-1089) |
Same As/Similar To
SR84 (Related) 2015-02-23 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1033-1034)
SR88 (Related) 2015-02-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1134-1135; text as passed Senate: CR S1170-1171)
SR372 (Same As) 2016-02-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1000-1001)
SR88 (Related) 2015-02-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1134-1135; text as passed Senate: CR S1170-1171)
SR372 (Same As) 2016-02-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1000-1001)
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Ethnic studies
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Ethnic studies
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-resolution/379/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/sres379/BILLS-114sres379ats.pdf |