US SR782 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-8-3)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4862-4863)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4862-4863)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4862-4863) |
Same As/Similar To
HR706 (Related) 2021-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1353 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7975)
SR417 (Related) 2021-10-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/07/2021 CR S7005-7006)
HR1353 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7975)
SR417 (Related) 2021-10-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/07/2021 CR S7005-7006)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/782/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres782/BILLS-117sres782ats.pdf |