US HR706 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States.
Title
Recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-10-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR417 (Related) 2021-10-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/07/2021 CR S7005-7006)
HR1353 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7975)
SR782 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4862-4863)
HR1353 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7975)
SR782 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4862-4863)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/706/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres706/BILLS-117hres706ih.pdf |