US SR417 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-8-3)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/07/2021 CR S7005-7006)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/07/2021 CR S7005-7006)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-18 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/07/2021 CR S7005-7006) |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7028) |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR706 (Related) 2021-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR782 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4862-4863)
SR782 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4862-4863)