US SR761 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6599-6600)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6599-6600)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the month of October 2020 as Filipino American History Month and celebrating the history and culture of Filipino Americans and their immense contributions to the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the month of October 2020 as Filipino American History Month and celebrating the history and culture of Filipino Americans and their immense contributions to the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6599-6600) |
Same As/Similar To
HR621 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8603)
HR1166 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR401 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6357; text: CR S6342-6343)
HR1166 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR401 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6357; text: CR S6342-6343)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/761/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres761/BILLS-116sres761is.pdf |