US SR401 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1-1)
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6357; text: CR S6342-6343)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6357; text: CR S6342-6343)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the October 2019 celebration of Filipino American History Month as a testament to the advancement of Filipino Americans and a time to reflect on and remember the many notable contributions of Filipino Americans to the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the month of October 2019 as Filipino American History Month and celebrating the history and culture of Filipino Americans and their immense contributions to the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6357; text: CR S6342-6343) |
Same As/Similar To
HR621 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8603)
HR1166 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR761 (Related) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6599-6600)
HR1166 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR761 (Related) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6599-6600)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/401/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres401/BILLS-116sres401ats.pdf |