US HR621 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8603)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8603)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses the House of Representatives' support for the celebration of Filipino American History Month as a testament to the long and proud advancement of Filipino Americans and a time to renew efforts toward researching and examining the history of Filipino Americans to give all people of the United States an opportunity to learn about their contributions.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the month of October 2019, as Filipino American History Month and celebrating the history and culture of Filipino Americans and their immense contributions to the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8603) |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-10-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR401 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6357; text: CR S6342-6343)
HR1166 (Same As) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR761 (Related) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6599-6600)
HR1166 (Same As) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR761 (Related) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6599-6600)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/621/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres621/BILLS-116hres621ih.pdf |