US SR670 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7773-7774; text as passed Senate: CR S7774; text of measure as introduced: CR S7838)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7773-7774; text as passed Senate: CR S7774; text of measure as introduced: CR S7838)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the week beginning on Monday, November 8, 2010, as National Veterans History Project Week. Calls on the people of the United States to interview at least one veteran in their families or communities according to guidelines provided by the Veterans History Project. Encourages national, state, and local organizations along with federal, state, city and county governmental institutions to participate in support of the effort to document, preserve, and honor the service of U.S. veterans.
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning on Monday, November 8, 2010, as "National Veterans History Project Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Byron Dorgan [D-ND] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] | Sen. Blanche Lincoln [D-AR] |
Sen. Richard Lugar [R-IN] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7773-7774; text as passed Senate: CR S7774; text of measure as introduced: CR S7838) |
Same As/Similar To
HR866 (Related) 2009-11-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1644 (Related) 2010-11-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR340 (Related) 2009-11-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S11354)
SR648 (Related) 2010-09-27 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7515-7516)
HR1644 (Related) 2010-11-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR340 (Related) 2009-11-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S11354)
SR648 (Related) 2010-09-27 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7515-7516)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Historical and cultural resources
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Commemorative events and holidays
Historical and cultural resources
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-resolution/670/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/sres670/BILLS-111sres670ats.pdf |