US SR658 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2737-2738; text: CR S2759-2760)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2737-2738; text: CR S2759-2760)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating June 6, 2022, as "CASA/GAL Volunteers' Day".
Title
A resolution designating June 6, 2022, as "CASA/GAL Volunteers' Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2737-2738; text: CR S2759-2760) |
Same As/Similar To
HR412 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR219 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/18/2021 CR S2575-2576)
HR1157 (Related) 2022-06-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR219 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/18/2021 CR S2575-2576)
HR1157 (Related) 2022-06-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/658/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres658/BILLS-117sres658ats.pdf |