US SR219 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/18/2021 CR S2575-2576)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/18/2021 CR S2575-2576)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating May 18, 2021, as "CASA/GAL Volunteers' Day".
Title
A resolution designating May 18, 2021, as "CASA/GAL Volunteers' Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/18/2021 CR S2575-2576) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4795) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR412 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR658 (Related) 2022-05-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2737-2738; text: CR S2759-2760)
SR658 (Related) 2022-05-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2737-2738; text: CR S2759-2760)