US SR63 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1313)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1313)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week of October 29 through November 4, 2017, as "National Obesity Care Week". Expresses support for the designation of National Obesity Care Week. Encourages open communication to break barriers of misunderstanding and stigma regarding obesity and to improve the lives of individuals affected by obesity and their families.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week of October 29 through November 4, 2017, as "National Obesity Care Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1313) |
Same As/Similar To
HR142 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR325 (Related) 2017-11-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7121; text: CR S7120)
SR325 (Related) 2017-11-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7121; text: CR S7120)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/63/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres63/BILLS-115sres63is.pdf |