US SR616 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/11/2020 CR S2937)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/11/2020 CR S2937)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates June 12, 2020, as Women Veterans Appreciation Day to recognize the service and sacrifices of women veterans who have served valiantly on behalf of the United States.
Title
A resolution designating June 12, 2020, as "Women Veterans Appreciation Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/11/2020 CR S2937) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3110) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR438 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1000 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR235 (Related) 2019-06-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3804)
HR1000 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR235 (Related) 2019-06-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3804)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Women's employment
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Women's employment