US SR235 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3804)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution designating June 12, 2019, as "Women Veterans Appreciation Day". This resolution designates June 12, 2019, as Women Veterans Appreciation Day to recognize the service and sacrifices of women veterans who have served valiantly on behalf of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution designating June 12, 2019, as "Women Veterans Appreciation Day".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3804)
2019-06-18SenateS.Amdt.750 Amendment SA 750 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2019-06-18SenateS.Amdt.750 Amendment SA 750 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Booker. (consideration: CR S3804; text: CR S3804) To amend the preamble.
2019-06-18SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
2019-06-18SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3804)
2019-06-05SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3263)

Same As/Similar To

HR438 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR438 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback