US SR426 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2280-2283; text: CR S2281-2283)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2280-2283; text: CR S2281-2283)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the goals of International Women's Day. Supports the goals of International Women's Day. Recognizes that the empowerment of women is linked to a country's potential to generate economic growth, sustainable democracy, and inclusive security. Recognizes individuals in the United States and around the world, including women human rights defenders and civil society leaders, who have worked to ensure that women are guaranteed equality and basic human rights. Recognizes the unique cultural, historical, and religious differences throughout the world and urges the U.S. government to act with respect and understanding toward legitimate differences when promoting any policies. Reaffirms the commitment to: (1) end discrimination and violence against women and girls, and ensure their safety and welfare; (2) pursue policies that guarantee the basic human rights of women and girls worldwide; and (3) promote women's participation in every aspect of society and community. Supports sustainable global development that seeks to achieve gender equality.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals of International Women's Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2280-2283; text: CR S2281-2283) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 361. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1581-1582) |
Same As/Similar To
SR84 (Same As) 2017-03-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1695-1696; text of measure as introduced: CR S1693-1694)
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Crimes against women
Economic development
Human rights
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's employment
Women's rights
Commemorative events and holidays
Crimes against women
Economic development
Human rights
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's employment
Women's rights