US SR401 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating May 5, 2018 as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls". Designates May 5, 2018, as the National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls.
Title
A resolution designating May 5, 2018 as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls".
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S876) |
Same As/Similar To
SR60 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2728)
HR222 (Related) 2017-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
HR222 (Related) 2017-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Indian social and development programs
Violent crime
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Indian social and development programs
Violent crime