US HR222 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of May 5, 2017, as "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls". Supports the designation of National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls.
Title
Expressing support for designation of May 5, 2017, as "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls".
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR60 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2728)
SR401 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443)
SR401 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443)
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Indian social and development programs
Violent crime
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Indian social and development programs
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/222/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres222/BILLS-115hres222ih.pdf |