US SR60 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2728)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2728)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating May 5, 2017, as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls". Designates May 5, 2017, as the National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls.
Title
A resolution designating May 5, 2017, as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls".
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2728) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2728) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1131) |
Same As/Similar To
HR222 (Related) 2017-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
SR401 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443)
SR401 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2443)
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Indian social and development programs
Violent crime
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Indian social and development programs
Violent crime