US SR318 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S82; text as passed Senate: CR S82)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S82; text as passed Senate: CR S82)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Condemns the political violence in Bangladesh and urges political leaders to engage in a dialogue toward free and credible elections. Supports ongoing efforts by United Nations (U.N.) Assistant Secretary General Oscar Fernandez-Taranco to foster political dialogue in Bangladesh. Urges: (1) the government of Bangladesh to ensure judicial independence, end harassment of human rights activists, and restore the independence of the Grameen Bank; and (2) political leaders in Bangladesh to ensure the safety and access of election observers, and to rein in and to condemn the violence and provide space for peaceful political protests.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate regarding the critical need for political dialogue in Bangladesh, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-07 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S82; text as passed Senate: CR S82) |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9093-9094) |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 273. |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and an amendment to the title and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S8674) |
Subjects
Asia
Bangladesh
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Credit and credit markets
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
Judicial procedure and administration
Protest and dissent
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations
Bangladesh
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Credit and credit markets
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
Judicial procedure and administration
Protest and dissent
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations