US SR288 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-06 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6354-6356; text as passed Senate: CR S6354-6355; text of measure as introduced: CR S6349)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-06 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6354-6356; text as passed Senate: CR S6354-6355; text of measure as introduced: CR S6349)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the week beginning on October 9, 2011, as National Wildlife Refuge Week. Encourages the observance of National Wildlife Refuge Week with appropriate events and activities. Reaffirms the support of the Senate for wildlife conservation and the National Wildlife Refuge System.
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning October 9, 2011, as "National Wildlife Refuge Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Scott Brown [R-MA] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-06 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6354-6356; text as passed Senate: CR S6354-6355; text of measure as introduced: CR S6349) |
Same As/Similar To
HR580 (Related) 2012-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SR580 (Related) 2012-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6679-6684; text as passed Senate: CR 9/21/2012 S6681; text of measure as introduced: CR 9/21/2012 S6631-6632)
SR580 (Related) 2012-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6679-6684; text as passed Senate: CR 9/21/2012 S6681; text of measure as introduced: CR 9/21/2012 S6631-6632)
Subjects
Animals
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-resolution/288/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sres288/BILLS-112sres288ats.pdf |