US SR268 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-06 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7888-7889)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-06 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7888-7889)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Condemns the atrocities and terrorist attack that occurred at the Westgate Mall in Nairobi, Kenya, from September 21 through 24, 2013. Offers condolences to the families, friends, and loved ones of those who were killed in the attack and expresses hope for the recovery of the wounded, including U.S. citizens. Recognizes the many heroic acts by Kenyan citizens, first responders, and the Kenya Red Cross to rescue those caught in the Westgate Mall attack. Reaffirms U.S. support for the efforts of the government and people of Kenya to combat terrorism, promote tolerance, and bring the perpetrators of the Westgate Mall attack to justice. Commends Kenya's continued participation in the African Union Mission in Somalia. Recognizes Kenya as an important U.S. ally and partner.
Title
A resolution condemning the September 2013 terrorist attack at the Westgate Mall in Nairobi, Kenya, and reaffirming United States support for the people and Government of Kenya, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-06 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7888-7889) |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 234. |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-10-11 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7414) |
Same As/Similar To
HR394 (Same As) 2013-12-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Subjects
Africa
Alliances
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
First responders and emergency personnel
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Kenya
Somalia
Terrorism
Alliances
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
First responders and emergency personnel
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Kenya
Somalia
Terrorism