US SR267 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5631-5632; text as passed Senate: CR S5632; text of measure as introduced: CR S5629)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5631-5632; text as passed Senate: CR S5632; text of measure as introduced: CR S5629)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the celebration of Hispanic Heritage Month from September 15, 2011, through October 15, 2011. Esteems the integral role of Latinos and their manifold heritage in the economy, culture, and identity of the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Daniel Akaka [D-HI] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Kay Hagan [D-NC] |
Sen. Daniel Inouye [D-HI] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-14 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5631-5632; text as passed Senate: CR S5632; text of measure as introduced: CR S5629) |
Same As/Similar To
SR582 (Related) 2012-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6679-6684; text as passed Senate: CR 9/21/2012 S6682; text of measure as introduced: CR 9/21/2012 S6632-6633)
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Historical and cultural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Historical and cultural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-resolution/267/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sres267/BILLS-112sres267ats.pdf |