US SR214 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-16-1)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating June 19, 2017, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which slavery legally came to an end in the United States.
Title
A resolution designating June 19, 2017, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which slavery legally came to an end in the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-01 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695) |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3864-3865) |
Same As/Similar To
HR936 (Related) 2018-06-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR547 (Related) 2018-06-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3958; text: CR S3954)
HR948 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR547 (Related) 2018-06-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3958; text: CR S3954)
HR948 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history