US HR936 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of June 19, 2018, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which slavery legally came to an end in the United States. Expresses support for the designation of Juneteenth Independence Day. Recognizes the historical significance and supports the continued celebration of Juneteenth Independence Day, which commemorates the end of slavery in the United States.
Title
Expressing support for designation of June 19, 2018, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which slavery legally came to an end in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR214 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695)
SR547 (Related) 2018-06-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3958; text: CR S3954)
HR386 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR948 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR547 (Related) 2018-06-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3958; text: CR S3954)
HR386 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR948 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/936/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres936/BILLS-115hres936ih.pdf |