US SR547 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15-1)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3958; text: CR S3954)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3958; text: CR S3954)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating June 19, 2018, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which slavery legally came to an end in the United States.
Title
A resolution designating June 19, 2018, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which slavery legally came to an end in the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3958; text: CR S3954) |
Same As/Similar To
HR936 (Related) 2018-06-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR214 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695)
HR948 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR386 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR214 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695)
HR948 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR386 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/547/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres547/BILLS-115sres547ats.pdf |