US SR197 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1537)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1537)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week of May 1, 2023, through May 7, 2023, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week".
Title
A resolution designating the week of May 1, 2023, through May 7, 2023, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1537) |
Same As/Similar To
HR367 (Related) 2023-05-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-resolution/197/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/sres197/BILLS-118sres197is.pdf |