US HR367 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the week of May 1, 2023, through May 7, 2023, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week".
Title
Designating the week of May 1, 2023, through May 7, 2023, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Aaron Bean [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-05-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-05-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR197 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1537)
HR1200 (Same As) 2024-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1200 (Same As) 2024-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/367/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres367/BILLS-118hres367ih.pdf |