US SJR36 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 40. Record Vote Number: 231.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval of the proposed transfer to the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland, the Kingdom of Spain, and the Italian Republic of certain defense articles and services. This joint resolution prohibits the proposed sale of various defense articles and related support services to Saudi Arabia, the United Kingdom, Spain, and Italy, as described in Executive Communication 1427 published in the Congressional Record on June 3, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval of the proposed transfer to the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland, the Kingdom of Spain, and the Italian Republic of certain defense articles and services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-29 - Senate - Failed of passage in Senate over veto RC# 231 (Y: 45 N: 40 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-17 - House - On passage RC# 486 (Y: 238 N: 190 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 177 (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-29HouseFailed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 40. Record Vote Number: 231.
2019-07-29HouseVeto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S5126, S5130-5134)
2019-07-24HouseVeto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk. (text: CR S5051-5052)
2019-07-24HouseVetoed by President.
2019-07-24HousePresented to President.
2019-07-17HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 238 - 190 (Roll no. 486). (text: CR H5935)
2019-07-17HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5975-5976)
2019-07-17HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on S.J. Res. 36, the Chair put the question on passage of the joint resolution and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McCaul demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day.
2019-07-17HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-07-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with twenty minutes of debate on S.J. Res. 36.
2019-07-17HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 3494 and H. Res. 489 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3494 under a structured rule; provides for consideration of a resolution relating to House Report 116-125, if called up by direction of the Committee on Overisight and Reform; provides for consideration of a joint resolution reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs regarding the Arms Export Control Act; provides for consideration of H. Res. 489.
2019-07-17HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 491. (consideration: CR H5935-5938)
2019-06-20HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-06-20HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-06-20HouseReceived in the House.
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 177. (text: CR S4142)
2019-06-20SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S4142)
2019-06-19SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3831-3834)
2019-06-19SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2019-06-18SenateMotion to discharge Senate Committee on Foreign Relations made. (Pursuant to the Arms Export Control Act of 1976). (consideration: CR S3633-3637)
2019-06-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HJR64 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HR491 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback