US SJR29 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to "COVID-19 Vaccination and Testing; Emergency Temporary Standard".
Title
A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to "COVID-19 Vaccination and Testing; Emergency Temporary Standard".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-12-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 48. Record Vote Number: 489. (text: CR S9034) |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S9007, S9034) |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (CR S9007) |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 178. |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by petition pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c). |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR62 (Related) 2021-11-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HJR65 (Same As) 2021-11-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HJR65 (Same As) 2021-11-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.