US HJR62 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the interim final rule of the Occupational Safety and Health Administration relating to "COVID-19 Vaccination and Testing; Emergency Temporary Standard".
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the interim final rule of the Occupational Safety and Health Administration relating to "COVID-19 Vaccination and Testing; Emergency Temporary Standard".
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-11-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR29 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HJR65 (Related) 2021-11-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SJR29 (Related) 2021-12-09 - Held at the desk.
HJR65 (Related) 2021-11-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SJR29 (Related) 2021-12-09 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-joint-resolution/62/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hjres62/BILLS-117hjres62ih.pdf |