US SCR31 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of the Senate to make corrections to the enrollment of S. 1280 (Kate Puzey Peace Corps Volunteer Protection Act of 2011) to: (1) amend the Peace Corps Act to terminate on October 1, 2018, provisions providing for the establishment of the Office of Victim Advocacy and the Sexual Assault Advisory Council; (2) terminate by that date the requirements that the President annually conduct a confidential survey of volunteers regarding Peace Corps programs and staff effectiveness and volunteer safety and annually submit information on sexual assault and other crimes against volunteers; (3) terminate by that date the requirement that the Peace Corps Inspector General submit a biennial report on reports received from volunteers relating to misconduct, mismanagement, or policy violations by Peace Corps staff, breaches of confidentiality of volunteers, and actions taken to assure the safety of volunteers who provide such reports; (4) change the interval for Inspector General reports on the effectiveness and implementation of the sexual assault risk-reduction and response training and the sexual assault policy; (5) direct the President, rather than the Peace Corps Director, to perform a review at least every three years to evaluate the allocation and delivery of resources across the countries the Peace Corps serves and, at the request of the Chairman and Ranking Member of the Senate or House Foreign Relations Committee, to brief such committees on each such review; and (6) repeal provisions terminating such Act seven years after its enactment.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Secretary of the Senate to make a correction in the enrollment of S. 1280.
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-11-01 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H7185) |
2011-11-01 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7185) |
2011-11-01 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2011-10-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2011-10-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6562; text as passed Senate: CR S6562; text of measure as introduced: CR S6516) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1280 (Related) 2011-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 112-57.