US SB994 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Became Public Law No: 115-249. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Became Public Law No: 115-249. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Religiously Affiliated Institutions Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the federal criminal code to modify an existing prohibition on intentionally obstructing, by force or threat of force, a person in the free exercise of religious beliefs. The bill specifies that, with respect to the prohibition, a threat of force includes a threat of force against religious real property. Additionally, it establishes a criminal penalty—a fine, a prison term of up to three years, or both—for a violation that results in damage or destruction to religious real property in an amount that exceeds $5,000. Finally, the bill broadens the definition of "religious real property" to include real property owned or leased by a nonprofit, religiously affiliated organization.
Title
Protecting Religiously Affiliated Institutions Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-249. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-09-28 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-09-18 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-09-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-07 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7925) |
2018-09-07 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7925) |
2018-09-07 | House | Mrs. Handel asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2018-09-05 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-09-05 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6032-6033; text of measure as passed: CR S6033) |
2018-08-22 | Senate | By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 115-325. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 394. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1730 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.