US SB931 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Became Public Law No: 115-220. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Became Public Law No: 115-220. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4910 Brighton Boulevard in Denver, Colorado, as the "George Sakato Post Office". (Sec. 1) Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4910 Brighton Boulevard in Denver, Colorado, as the "George Sakato Post Office."
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4910 Brighton Boulevard in Denver, Colorado, as the "George Sakato Post Office".
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-220. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-07-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-07-19 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-07-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6206) |
2018-07-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 931. |
2018-07-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6206-6207) |
2018-07-16 | House | Mr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-03-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-03-08 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-03-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1525-1527; text: CR S1527) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 313. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Colorado
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Veterans' organizations and recognition