US SB903 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 217.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 217.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the Secretary of Energy to establish advanced nuclear goals, provide for a versatile, reactor-based fast neutron source, make available high-assay, low-enriched uranium for research, development, and demonstration of advanced nuclear reactor concepts, and for other purposes.
Title
Nuclear Energy Leadership Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 217. |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-114. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 116-295. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3306 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB3358 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB3358 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Higher education
Lighting, heating, cooling
Nuclear power
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Public-private cooperation
Radioactive wastes and releases
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Student aid and college costs
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Higher education
Lighting, heating, cooling
Nuclear power
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Public-private cooperation
Radioactive wastes and releases
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Student aid and college costs