US SB903 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Nuclear Energy Leadership Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nuclear Energy Leadership Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-04-30SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
2019-03-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB3306 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB3358 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback