US SB875 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Comptroller General of the United States to conduct a study and submit a report on filing requirements under the Universal Service Fund programs. (Sec. 1) This bill requires the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to report to the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) and Congress on the filing requirements for telecommunications carriers or service providers that receive Universal Service Fund support under the Communications Act of 1934 to provide service to qualifying low-income consumers, rural or high-cost areas, rural health care providers, schools, or libraries under the Connect America Fund, Lifeline, E-Rate, Rural Health Care, Remote Areas Fund, Connect America Fund Broadband Loop Support, Mobility Fund, and High Cost Loop Support for Rate-of-Return Carriers programs. The report must analyze the financial impact of those filing requirements and provide any recommendations on how to consolidate redundant filing requirements. After receiving the GAO's report, the FCC must initiate a rulemaking to consolidate redundant filing requirements and incorporate any GAO recommendations that would not violate the Administrative Procedure Act into such rulemaking or any ongoing rulemakings.
Title
A bill to require the Comptroller General of the United States to conduct a study and submit a report on filing requirements under the Universal Service Fund programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-01-11 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-01-11 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S141-142; text: CR S142) |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 282. |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-192. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3523 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Educational facilities and institutions
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Libraries and archives
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Congressional oversight
Educational facilities and institutions
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Libraries and archives
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees