US SB766 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Devil's Staircase Wilderness Act of 2011 - Designates certain federal land in Oregon administered by the Forest Service and the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) as the Devil's Staircase Wilderness and as wilderness and as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System. Specifies this Act's effect on: (1) Oregon's jurisdiction and responsibilities with respect to fish and wildlife, (2) protective perimeters and buffer zones around the Wilderness, (3) activities and uses outside of the boundary of the Wilderness, and (4) treaty rights of Indian tribes. Transfers the administrative jurisdiction over BLM land north of the Umpqua River to the Forest Service. Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate Franklin and Wasson Creeks in Oregon as wild rivers and as components of the Wild and Scenic Rivers System.
Title
Devil's Staircase Wilderness Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 277. |
2012-01-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/17/2011 without amendment. With written report No. 112-115. |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Forests. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-39. |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2276-2277) |
Subjects
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Land transfers
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats