US SB747 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, and Border Safety. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, and Border Safety. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide for the adjustment of status of essential workers, and for other purposes.
Title
Citizenship for Essential Workers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, and Border Safety. Hearings held. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1909 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB5517 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB2954 (Related) 2021-10-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7001)
HB5517 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB2954 (Related) 2021-10-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7001)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/747/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s747/BILLS-117s747is.pdf |