US HB5517 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to alter the definition of "conviction", and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Adjudications for Immigrants Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-10-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1177 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1909 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB348 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB747 (Related) 2021-05-12 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, and Border Safety. Hearings held.
SB2954 (Same As) 2021-10-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7001)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback