US SB713 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Heritage Area Authorization Act of 2017 (Sec. 3) This bill establishes: the Appalachian Forest National Heritage Area in West Virginia and Maryland, the Maritime Washington National Heritage Area and the Mountains to Sound Greenway National Heritage Area in Washington state, and the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta National Heritage Area in California. A local coordinating entity is designated for each heritage area. (Sec. 4) Each local coordinating entity shall: (1) prepare and submit for approval by the Department of the Interior a management plan for its respective heritage area; and (2) not use federal funding made available under this bill for the acquisition of real property or any interest in real property.
Title
National Heritage Area Authorization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 115-118. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1791 (Related) 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB1518 (Related) 2017-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SB627 (Related) 2017-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3100 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 478.
HB1518 (Related) 2017-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SB627 (Related) 2017-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3100 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 478.
Subjects
California
Congressional oversight
Forests, forestry, trees
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Maryland
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
West Virginia
Congressional oversight
Forests, forestry, trees
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Maryland
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
West Virginia