US HB1791 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Mountains to Sound Greenway National Heritage Act This bill establishes the Mountains to Sound Greenway National Heritage Area in the state of Washington. The Department of the Interior shall designate a willing local unit of government, Indian tribe, or nonprofit organization to serve as the local coordinating entity for the heritage area. Such entity shall prepare and submit a management plan for the area and assist federal, state, and local governments, tribes, regional planning organizations, nonprofit organizations, and other interested parties in carrying out such plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mountains to Sound Greenway National Heritage Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2018-06-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-06-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5604-5606)
2018-06-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1791.
2018-06-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5604-5607)
2018-06-25HouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-06-01HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 549.
2018-06-01HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-709.
2018-05-08HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2018-05-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-05-08HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2018-04-11HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-04-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-03-29HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-03-29HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB713 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155.
SB3100 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 478.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback