US SB533 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Mr. Carter (LA) asked unanimous consent that the ordering of the yeas and nays on the motion that the House suspend the rules and pass the bill S. 533 be vacated, to the end that the motion be considered as withdrawn. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Mr. Carter (LA) asked unanimous consent that the ordering of the yeas and nays on the motion that the House suspend the rules and pass the bill S. 533 be vacated, to the end that the motion be considered as withdrawn. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require a guidance clarity statement on certain agency guidance, and for other purposes.
Title
Guidance Clarity Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | House | Mr. Carter (LA) asked unanimous consent that the ordering of the yeas and nays on the motion that the House suspend the rules and pass the bill S. 533 be vacated, to the end that the motion be considered as withdrawn. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-09-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-09-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4624) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 346. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-95. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1508 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 353.