US HB1508 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 353.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 353.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require a guidance clarity statement on certain agency guidance, and for other purposes.
Title
Guidance Clarity Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 353. |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2021-10-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5690) |
2021-10-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1508. |
2021-10-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5689-5691) |
2021-10-20 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-07-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB533 (Same As) 2022-11-17 - Mr. Carter (LA) asked unanimous consent that the ordering of the yeas and nays on the motion that the House suspend the rules and pass the bill S. 533 be vacated, to the end that the motion be considered as withdrawn. Agreed to without objection.