US SB4573 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 529.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 529.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 3, United States Code, to reform the Electoral Count Act, and to amend the Presidential Transition Act of 1963 to provide clear guidelines for when and to whom resources are provided by the Administrator of General Services for use in connection with the preparations for the assumption of official duties as President or Vice President.
Title
Electoral Count Reform Act of 2022 Presidential Transition Improvement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 529. |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Reported by Senator Klobuchar under authority of the order of the Senate of 10/14/2022 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3545-3546) |
Same As/Similar To
HB8824 (Same As) 2022-09-14 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8846 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8846 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.