US SB444 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide or assist in providing an additional vehicle adapted for operation by disabled individuals to certain eligible persons.
Title
Advancing Uniform Transportation Opportunities for Veterans Act AUTO for Veterans Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1361 (Same As) 2021-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB3304 (Related) 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3304 (Related) 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/444/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s444/BILLS-117s444is.pdf |