US HB1361 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-23)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide or assist in providing an additional vehicle adapted for operation by disabled individuals to certain eligible persons.
Title
AUTO for Veterans Act Advancing Uniform Transportation Opportunities for Veterans Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB444 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB3304 (Related) 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3304 (Related) 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1361/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1361/BILLS-117hr1361ih.pdf |