US SB3942 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the position of Chief Pharmaceutical and Medical Supply Chain Negotiator in the Office of the U.S. Trade Representative. The negotiator must conduct trade negotiations and enforce trade agreements related to pharmaceutical products and services and medical supply chains.
Title
Securing America’s Medical Supply Chain and Advancing the Production of Life Saving Medicines Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB2209 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
HB3947 (Related) 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2209 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
HB3947 (Related) 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign trade and international finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Prescription drugs
Trade agreements and negotiations
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign trade and international finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Prescription drugs
Trade agreements and negotiations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3942/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3942/BILLS-116s3942is.pdf |