US SB3762 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide greater output, price stability, and regulatory certainty with respect to domestic energy production in the United States and exports, and for other purposes.
Title
Energy Freedom Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB543 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2705 (Related) 2021-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB7094 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB76 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1011 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2705 (Related) 2021-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB7094 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB76 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1011 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3762/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3762/BILLS-117s3762is.pdf |