US HB543 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 56-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the President from issuing moratoria on leasing and permitting energy and minerals on certain Federal land, and for other purposes.
Title
POWER Act Protecting Our Wealth of Energy Resources Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-02-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H367) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB76 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB859 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB4334 (Related) 2021-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB6858 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
SB3752 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB7094 (Related) 2022-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB3762 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB859 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB4334 (Related) 2021-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB6858 (Related) 2022-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
SB3752 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB7094 (Related) 2022-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB3762 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/543/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr543/BILLS-117hr543ih.pdf |